Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lopez, Ernesto, Lopez, Evangelina, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Vicky Huezo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 01, 2010 |
CategoryGuardianship: Person Only |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Cycle Time65 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 513610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [513610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Aug 5 2010 Type: 532910 - Dismissal: Court Ordered Manner : 511110 - Before Trial |
|
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing 511110-Hearing: Petition;C Certified Guardianship of Lopez, Favian ; Judge: J21196 Price Diane Judge: Price, Diane |
|
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Agreement 533210-Agreement Filed/Issued By: 923110 - Clerk AGREEMENT [533210] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By CLERK [923110] |
|
July 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Mediation Appointment 531110-Mediation Appointment; Guardianship of Lopez, Favian ; Judge: FL0014 Huezo Vicky Judge: Huezo, Vicky |
|
July 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing 511110-Hearing: Petition;C Certified Guardianship of Lopez, Favian ; Judge: J21196 Price Diane Judge: Price, Diane |
|
July 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 512920-Notice of Hearing Filed/Issued By: NOTICE OF HEARING [512920] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
July 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 512920-Notice of Hearing Filed/Issued By: NOTICE OF HEARING [512920] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
July 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing 511110-Hearing: Petition;I Interp. Not Used/Needed This Date Guardianship of Lopez, Favian ; Judge: J21196 Price Diane Judge: Price, Diane |
|
July 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 513610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [513610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.