Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Johnson, Shellie, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Grays Harbor County, WA, . Grays Harbor County, WA Superior Courts with David L. Mistachkin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2023 |
CategoryEst Estate |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationGrays Harbor County, WA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2023 | Affidavit of Publication | ||
October 30, 2023 |
Creditors Claim NORTHWEST EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS-$1,170.00 |
||
October 16, 2023 |
Creditors Claim NORTHWEST EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS LLC-$1,170.00 |
||
October 02, 2023 |
Request FOR SPECIAL NOTICE OF PROCEEDINGS |
||
October 02, 2023 | Notice of Appearance | ||
September 22, 2023 |
Declaration of Mailing OF PROBATE NOTICE TO CREDITORS TO WDSHS |
||
September 22, 2023 |
Notice to Creditors PROBATE |
||
September 22, 2023 | Notice of Appointment and Pendency of Probate | ||
September 22, 2023 |
Affidavit of Mailing Notice OF APPOINTMENT AND PENDENCY OF PROBATE |
||
September 20, 2023 |
Order Admitting Will Appt Personal Representative Adj Solv
Judge: Mistachkin, David L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.