Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Benedict, Crystal M, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Benedict, Kathleen Dell, against Burkhart, Laurie, Jordan, Nancy, Physical Theray Services, Summit Pacific Medical Center, represented by Melter, Mark Brandon, in the jurisdiction of Grays Harbor County, WA, . Grays Harbor County, WA Superior Courts with Katherine L. Svoboda presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 29, 2021 |
CategoryMed Medical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGrays Harbor County, WA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice Stipulated Judge: Svoboda, Katherine L |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury 12 Person | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of merit |
|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.