Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Pruett, Geary, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Kothari, Shree Sudhir, against First Interstate Bank Of Washington, in the jurisdiction of Grays Harbor County, WA, . Grays Harbor County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 14, 2020 |
CategoryQti Quiet Title |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGrays Harbor County, WA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Publication | |
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Mistachkin, David L |
|
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order for Publication AMENDED - of summons Judge: Mistachkin, David L |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons by Publication | |
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion to Serve by Publication | |
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order for Publication of summons Judge: Mistachkin, David L |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.