Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Condominium Owners Association, Phase Iii, Western Sky Management, Westport By The Sea Phase Iii, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Lanco Llc, in the jurisdiction of Grays Harbor County, WA, . Grays Harbor County, WA Superior Courts with David L. Edwards presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2008 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGrays Harbor County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss 7: MOTION TO DISMISS; |
|
September 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice 8: ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE; JUDGE DAVID EDWARDS; |
|
September 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
May 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order of Default 6: ORDER OF DEFAULT; JUDGE F. MARK MCCAULEY; |
|
April 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 5: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; CHARLES MAPLES FOR LANCO LLC; |
|
April 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default 4: MOTION FOR DEFAULT UNIT 1211; |
|
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 3: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; CHARLES MAPLES; |
|
December 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Summons 2: SUMMONS; |
|
December 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Complaint 1: COMPLAINT; RECORDING 2008-08130030; |
|
December 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Received -: FILING FEE RECEIVED; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.