Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Pharia Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Anderson, Jason, against Renville, Garret, Renville, Jane Doe, in the jurisdiction of Grays Harbor County, WA, . Grays Harbor County, WA Superior Courts with Stephen E. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2008 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGrays Harbor County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Substitution of Counsel | |
July 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
July 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Assignment of Judgment | |
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certification of extension of Judgment |
|
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Extending Jurisdiction
Judge: Brown, Stephen E |
|
April 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Assignment of Judgment 8: ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT; |
|
April 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 7: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
December 08, 2008 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT; JUDGE DAVID EDWARDS; | |
December 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order of Default 6: ORDER OF DEFAULT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.