Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Light, Martina Lynn filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Grays Harbor County, WA, . Grays Harbor County, WA Superior Courts with F. Mark McCauley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeF. Mark McCauley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 10, 2007 |
CategoryDvp Domestic Violence |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGrays Harbor County, WA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Receipts 11: RECEIPT(S) ABERDEEN PD; |
|
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal 10: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; JUDGE F. MARK MCCAULEY; |
|
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss 9: MOTION TO DISMISS; |
|
January 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Return of Service 7: RETURN OF SERVICE; |
|
January 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Receipts 8: RECEIPT(S) APD; |
|
December 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order for Protection 6: ORD FOR PROTECTION; JUDGE DAVID FOSCUE; |
|
December 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 5: MOTION HEARING; |
|
December 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
H3 Protective ORDER FOR PROTECTION |
|
December 24, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
December 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Return of Service 4: RETURN OF SERVICE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.