Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hoffman, Donna J, Hoffman, Joseph J, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Acres, Zachary William, against American Recreational Communities, Llc, Matson, Mark W, Warden Lake Cottages Inc, represented by Reagan, Stephen W, in the jurisdiction of Grant County, WA, . Grant County, WA Superior Courts with John D. Knodell, III presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn D. Knodell, III Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 20, 2020 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGrant County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order to Disburse Funds IN COURT REGISTRY Judge: Knodell, John D, III |
|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DISBURSE FUNDS INTO COURT REGISTRY (PLTF)(100) Judge: Knodell, John D, III |
|
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DISBURSE FUNDS INTO CT REGISTRY |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing TO STRIKE TRIAL DATE (DEF)(88) |
|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice OF SETTLEMENT |
|
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket 12-06-2022 MOTION TO STRIKE TRIAL DATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.