Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Keybank National Association, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Krattli, Darren Robert, against Baker, Leon R, Baker, Lorraine, Leon R Baker Farms Llc, in the jurisdiction of Grant County, WA, . Grant County, WA Superior Courts with John D. Knodell, III presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2018 |
CategoryFju Foreign Judgment |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationGrant County, WA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Release OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT |
|
April 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing TO OBTAIN CHARGING ORDER |
|
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing TO OBTAIN CHARGING ORDER |
|
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment | |
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment RE: WA TRUST BANK |
|
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment RE: MCCAIN FOODS USA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.