Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pruneda, Rigoberto, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Kane, Scott Michael, against Cascade Agronomics Llc, represented by Wallace, Nicholas Lee, in the jurisdiction of Grant County, WA, . Grant County, WA Superior Courts with Nick Wallace presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2015 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedMay 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationGrant County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 7: NOTE FOR MOTION DOCKET-2ND @ 4:00PM; 05-21-2015; NOTE FOR MOTION DOCKET-2ND @ 4:00PM; MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; (DEF); *STRICKEN PER NICK WALLACE*; STRIKE TAKEN BY HRH; |
|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice 8: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; |
|
March 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket 7: NOTE FOR MOTION DOCKET-2ND @ 4:00PM; 05-21-2015; NOTE FOR MOTION DOCKET-2ND @ 4:00PM; MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; (DEF); *STRICKEN PER NICK WALLACE*; STRIKE TAKEN BY HRH; |
|
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order for Change of Judge 6: ORDER FOR CHANGE OF JUDGE - JDK; |
|
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion and Affidavit Declaration 5: MTN & AFF FOR CHANGE OF JUDGE; |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Answer 4: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER; |
|
June 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Return of Service 3: RETURN OF SERVICE; |
|
June 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance 2: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; |
|
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Summons and Complaint 1: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.