Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Maine, Herbert L, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Heaps, Mitchell J, against Olsen, Jane Doe H W, Olsen, Kenneth J, in the jurisdiction of Grant County, WA, . Grant County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2010 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationGrant County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
November 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice 11: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; |
|
July 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Absence Unavailability 10: NOTICE OF ABSENCE/UNAVAILABILITY; ATTY FOR DEFENDANT: WATKINS, SARA L; |
|
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Witness List 9: DEF DISCL OF EXPERT WITNESSES; |
|
April 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 7: NOTICE OF STAT CONF @ 1:10 PM JMA; 04-04-2011; |
|
April 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Schedule 8: ORDER SETTING CASE SCHEDULE; |
|
February 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Status Conference 7: NOTICE OF STAT CONF @ 1:10 PM JMA; 04-04-2011; |
|
January 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service by Mail 6: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL; |
|
January 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense 5: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE; |
|
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Mailing 4: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.