Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Arabadji, Vecheslav, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Wallace, Nicholas Lee, against Arabadji, George, in the jurisdiction of Grant County, WA, . Grant County, WA Superior Courts with Nick Wallace presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 24, 2010 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGrant County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Partial Satisfaction of Judgment 24: PARTIAL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; |
|
April 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment 23: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; |
|
April 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order of Default 22: ORDER OF DEFAULT; |
|
April 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default 21: MOTION FOR DEFAULT; |
|
April 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment | |
April 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 20: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint 19: AMENDED COMPLAINT W/SUMMONS; |
|
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Hearing Cancelled Plaintiff Prosecution Requested 18: CANCELLED: PLAINTIFF/PROS REQUESTED; |
|
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
AM Motions MOTION FOR ORDER OF DEFAULT (PLTF)(16) *STRICKEN PER NICK WALLACE* |
|
March 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket 17: NOTE FOR MOTION DOCKET; 04-01-2011AM; MOTION FOR ORDER OF DEFAULT; (PLTF)(16); *STRICKEN PER NICK WALLACE*; STRIKE TAKEN BY MT/RGC; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.