Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ford Motor Credit, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against White, Patricia A, White, John Doe, in the jurisdiction of Grant County, WA, . Grant County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2005 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGrant County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment 8: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; |
|
January 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Release 7: RELEASE OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 6: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
December 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 5: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
November 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 4: APL FOR GARN W/WRIT ATTACHED; ISSUED @ 1:04 PM; GARNISHEE DEFENDANT: US BANK OF WASHINGTON NA , NFN; |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Judgment 3: JUDGMENT STIPULATED; |
|
December 29, 2005 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
December 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 2: AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION OF SERVICE; |
|
December 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
Summons and Complaint 1: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FOR MONIES DUE; MOTOR VEHICLE RETAIL INSTALLMENT; CONTRACT; |
|
December 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Received -: FILING FEE RECEIVED; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.