Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kling, Gregory Lynn filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Grant County, WA, . Grant County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2005 |
CategoryDvp Domestic Violence |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGrant County, WA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 7: ORD FOR PROTECTION; 12-28-2006; |
|
January 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Service 8: SHERIFF'S RETURN OF SERVICE; |
|
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order for Protection 7: ORD FOR PROTECTION; 12-28-2006; |
|
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 6: MOTION HEARING; |
|
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Closed by Court Order After a Hearing | |
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
SM DOMESTIC VIOLENCE @ 8:30 AM (PET) |
|
December 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Temporary Order for Protection 5: TEMP ORD FOR PROTECTION; |
|
December 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Petition for Order for Protection 4: PET ORD FOR PROTECTION; |
|
December 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Service 3: SHERIFF'S RETURN OF SERVICE; |
|
December 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Petition for Order for Protection 1: PET ORD FOR PROTECTION - FAX; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.