Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Unifund Ccr, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Suttell & Hammer, P.S., against Jardine, John Doe H H, Jardine, Viki, in the jurisdiction of Grant County, WA, . Grant County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2005 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGrant County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Release OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT |
|
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Answer of Garnishee Defendant COSTS + AMT AGAINST GDF-$810.20 Judge: Knodell, John D, III |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR JUDGMENT AND ORDER TO PAY |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit IN SUPPORT OF GARNISHMENT JUDGMENT |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.