Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Chs Inc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Wallace, Nicholas Lee, against Hernandez, Jeri L, Hernandez, John Doe H H, in the jurisdiction of Grant County, WA, . Grant County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2005 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGrant County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 17: MOTION HEARING; |
|
March 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
AM Motions DEBTORS EXAM (PLTF) (9) |
|
March 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing Stricken In Court NonAppearance 16: HEARING STRICKEN:IN COURT NONAPPEAR; |
|
March 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
AM Motions DEBTORS EXAM (PLTF) (9) |
|
February 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Mailing 15: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING; |
|
February 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order for Exam 14: AMENDED ORD FOR EXAM OF JGMT DEBTOR; 03-10-2006AM; DEBTORS EXAM; (PLTF) (9); |
|
February 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Mailing 13: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING; |
|
February 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order for Exam 12: STIP ORD FOR EXAM OF JGMT DEBTOR; - UNSIGNED; |
|
January 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 11: AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION OF SERVICE; |
|
January 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion and Affidavit Declaration 9: MTN & DCLR FOR ORD OF EXAM OF JGMT; DEBTOR; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.