Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Reyerson, Jane Doe, Reyerson, Joel C., in the jurisdiction of Garfield County, WA, . Garfield County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 21, 2014 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationGarfield County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 21: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
February 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment 20: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
February 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Application 19: APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
December 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Answer 18: FIRST ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; FOR CONTINUING LIEN ON EARNINGS; |
|
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Application 16: APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ 17: WRIT OF CONT. LIEN ON EARNINGS; |
|
October 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Received -: FILING FEE RECEIVED $20; |
|
July 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 15: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ 14: WRIT OF CONTINUING LIEN ON EARNINGS; |
|
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Application 13: APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.