Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 07, 1991 |
CategoryFamily Support |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKings County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2005 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail
Judge: Rynda, Julienne L. |
|
July 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Minute Order - Granting
Judge: Rynda, Julienne L. |
|
July 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Motion: Modification of Child Support
Judge: Judge, Visiting |
|
July 28, 2005 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing (Governmental) | |
July 07, 2005 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
July 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
Minute Order
Judge: Rynda, Julienne L. |
|
July 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail
Judge: Rynda, Julienne L. |
|
July 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
Motion: Modification of Child Support
Judge: Judge, Visiting |
|
June 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
Prior to Court-Continued to
Judge: Rynda, Julienne L. |
|
May 24, 2005 | Docket Event |
Minute Order-Continuation
Judge: Rynda, Julienne L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.