Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
P & R Construction, Llc., filed a(n) Inj Injunction case represented by Davis, Brian G, against City Of Pasco, represented by Ferguson, Eric W, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, WA, . Franklin County, WA Superior Courts with John Ziobro presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn Ziobro Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 13, 2021 |
CategoryInj Injunction |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFranklin County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Ziobro, John Stephen |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION |
|
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit IN SUPPORT OF MEMORANDUM |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Issue | |
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Ekstrom, Alexander Carl |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CONTEMPT |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit IN SUPPORT OF MEMORANDUM |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Memorandum IN RESPONDE TO MOTION FOR ORDER OF DEFAULT |
|
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Issue | |
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit IN SUPPORT OF PLAINIFF'S MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.