Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Wellspoken Interpreting, Llc., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Childress, Bil, against Copiers Northwest, Inc., Onshoring, Llc., in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, WA, . Franklin County, WA Superior Courts with Samuel P. Swanberg presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSamuel P. Swanberg Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2020 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFranklin County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Swanberg, Samuel P |
|
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Clerks Order of Closure for Want of Prosecution
Judge: Swanberg, Samuel P |
|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution CORTNEY CORBET, ATTY |
|
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Withdraw | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Judge: Petersen, David L |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Petersen, David L |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Default FOR ONSHORING, LLC. Judge: Petersen, David L |
|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service AND ALEX PADILLA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.