Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hood, Eric, filed a(n) General Adminstrative - Administrative case against City Of Kahlotus, in the jurisdiction of Franklin County, WA, . Franklin County, WA Superior Courts with Samuel P. Swanberg presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSamuel P. Swanberg Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 11, 2020 |
CategoryPra Public Records Act |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationFranklin County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Adminstrative |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment IN FULL |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Swanberg, Samuel P |
|
November 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment Summary DEFAULT JUDGMENT Judge: Swanberg, Samuel P |
|
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Shea-Brown, Jacqueline |
|
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order AMENDED Judge: Shea-Brown, Jacqueline |
|
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Closed by Court Order After a Hearing | |
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Shea-Brown, Jacqueline |
|
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Shea-Brown, Jacqueline |
|
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT Judge: Shea-Brown, Jacqueline |
|
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Shea-Brown, Jacqueline |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.