Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) Lca Lower Court Appeal - Civil case in the jurisdiction of Ferry County, WA, . Ferry County, WA Superior Courts with Allen C. Nielson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 18, 2013 |
CategoryLca Lower Court Appeal - Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFerry County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Finality 23: CERTIFICATE OF FINALITY; |
|
December 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Withdraw 22: NOTICE OF INTENT TO WITHDRAW; |
|
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Transmittal Letter Copy Filed 21: TRANSMITTAL LETTER - COPY FILED; |
|
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Note - Accounting -: FILING FEE RECEIVED; 290.00; |
|
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Discretionary Review to Court of Appeals 20: NT OF DISCR. REVIEW TO CT OF APPEAL; |
|
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law 19: FINDINGS OF FACT&CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; |
|
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Court Decision to Affirm Appeal Review | |
March 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Withdraw 17: NOTICE OF INTENT TO WITHDRAW; |
|
March 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 18: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
March 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing -: MOTION HEARING; ALL APPEAR,ARGS HEARD,CRT UPHOLDS; LOWER COURT RULING,ORDER SIGNED; JUDGE ALLEN C. NIELSON, DEPT 2; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.