Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Douglas County, WA, . Douglas County, WA Superior Courts with Brian C. Huber presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian C. Huber Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 16, 2023 |
CategoryPps Parenting Plan/Child Support |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDouglas County, WA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2023 |
Presentation of Order
Judge: Huber, Brian C |
||
November 07, 2023 |
Domestic Violence Motion for Temporary Orders |
||
November 07, 2023 | Motion Hearing | ||
November 07, 2023 | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | ||
November 02, 2023 |
Declaration Affidavit of Dr. Ellen Mateo |
||
October 18, 2023 |
Declaration Affidavit Maryann Harris Neal |
||
October 18, 2023 |
Declaration Affidavit of Aleah Houck |
||
October 18, 2023 |
Declaration Affidavit of Daetta Harris |
||
October 18, 2023 | Confirmation of Parenting Class | ||
October 16, 2023 | Case Information Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.