Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Douglas County, WA, . Douglas County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 09, 2023 |
CategoryPps Parenting Plan/Child Support |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDouglas County, WA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2023 |
Motion Hearing Residential Schedule |
||
November 15, 2023 |
Notice of Hearing - Amended |
||
November 15, 2023 |
Proposed Order Findings Order on Motion for Default |
||
November 15, 2023 | Motion for Default | ||
November 03, 2023 | Notice of Hearing | ||
October 30, 2023 | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | ||
October 12, 2023 | Law Enforcement and Confidential Information Form | ||
October 09, 2023 | Summons | ||
October 09, 2023 | Cover Sealed Birth Certificate or Paternity Document | ||
October 09, 2023 | Confidential Information Form |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.