Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Pen, Justin Tanner filed a(n) Cpo Civil Protection Order case in the jurisdiction of Douglas County, WA, . Douglas County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2022 |
CategoryCpo Civil Protection Order |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDouglas County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order for Protection - Amended |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Protection Order Status |
|
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Protection | |
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Service Justin Pen |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Protection Order | |
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Temporary Order for Protection | |
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Law Enforcement and Confidential Information Form | |
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition for Order for Protection |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.