Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
David Wakefield Family Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Walker, Brian A, against American Contractors Indemnity Company, Campbell, Colleen Harvey, Campbell, Scott, River View Electric Llc, represented by Dishaw, Meredith Eileen, in the jurisdiction of Douglas County, WA, . Douglas County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2022 |
CategoryCbc Contractor Bond Complaint |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDouglas County, WA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing Motion for Default |
|
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer and Counterclaim | |
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Striking Hearing | |
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response To Motion for Order of Default |
|
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense of American Contractors Indemity Company |
|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit Of Brian A. Walker in Support of Motion for Order of Default |
|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Default | |
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance of American Contractors Indemnity Company |
|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.