Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Turner, Greg, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Kane, Scott Michael, against Amerifresh, Inc, represented by Smith, Devin M, in the jurisdiction of Douglas County, WA, . Douglas County, WA Superior Courts with John Hotchkiss presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 07, 2018 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDouglas County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion Petition to Compel Arbitration |
|
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Arbitration Judge: Hotchkiss, John |
|
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit of Jim Richter in Support of Defendant's Reply to Motion to Compel Arbitration |
|
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Reply - Defendant's Reply to Motion to Compel Arbitration |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Findings Denying Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration |
|
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit of Jim Richter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.