Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
American Express Centurion Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bleier, Elizabeth Ann, against Rovira, Carmen, represented by Bereliani, Sanaz Sarah, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Francisca P. Tisher presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 01, 2010 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time234 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Non-DCSS) 231210-OSC Hearing; American Express Centurion Bank vs. Rovira, C. Motion OSC Details: 221620 - DLR Status of Removed Case ; Judge: J21160 Tisher Francisca P. Judge: Tisher, Francisca P. |
|
November 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management 241110-Conference: Case Management; American Express Centurion Bank vs. Rovira, C. ; Judge: J21160 Tisher Francisca P. Judge: Tisher, Francisca P. |
|
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Dismissal 233910-Dismissal Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff DISMISSAL [233910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 212920-Notice of Hearing Filed/Issued By: 923110 - Clerk NOTICE OF HEARING [212920] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By CLERK [923110] |
|
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice 212910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 932210 - Attorney for Defendant NOTICE [212910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT [932210] |
|
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Jul 21 2010 Type: 243110 - Entry of Request for Dismissal Manner : 241210 - Before Trial: No Sttlmnt Cnf/ADR |
|
June 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) 212320-Proof of Service: Summons (DLR) Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff PROOF OF SERVICE: SUMMONS (DLR) [212320] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
June 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed 212210-Complaint Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff COMPLAINT [212210] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
June 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet 212350-Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET [212350] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
June 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed 222120-Summons: Filed Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff SUMMONS: FILED [222120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.