Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Douglas County, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case against Jones, Jane Doe H W, Jones, Eric Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Douglas County, WA, . Douglas County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2005 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationDouglas County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing Cancelled Plaintiff Prosecution Requested 20: CANCELLED: PLAINTIFF/PROS REQUESTED; |
|
August 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal 19: ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; MOTION, DECLARATION; |
|
August 08, 2006 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
August 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
CM Civil Motion Calendar Misc. Motions REVIEW HEARING |
|
June 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
CM Civil Motion Calendar Misc. Motions REVIEW ON VIOLATIONS |
|
June 26, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order on Show Cause 18: ORDER ON SHOW CAUSE & SETTING; 08-08-2006CM; REVIEW HEARING ON VIOLATION; REVIEW HEARING; |
|
May 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order on Show Cause 17: ORDER ON SHOW CAUSE AND SETTING; 06-27-2006CM; REVIEW HEARING ON VIOLATIONS; REVIEW ON VIOLATIONS; |
|
May 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing Cancelled Plaintiff Prosecution Requested 16: CANCELLED: PLAINTIFF/PROS REQUESTED; |
|
May 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
CM Civil Motion Calendar Misc. Motions REVIEW ON VIOLATIONS |
|
April 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing Stricken In Court NonAppearance 15: HEARING STRICKEN:IN COURT NONAPPEAR; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.