Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Brown, Benjamin Joshua filed a(n) Cpo Civil Protection Order case in the jurisdiction of Cowlitz County, WA, . Cowlitz County, WA Superior Courts with David A. Nelson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid A. Nelson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 28, 2022 |
CategoryCpo Civil Protection Order |
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCowlitz County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Closed by Court Order After a Hearing | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Domestic Violence Protection
Judge: Cotterell, Lindsey D |
|
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration of NonSurrender | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Copy of Supporting Evidence |
|
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing CT DISMISSES PETITION AND SIGNS DENIAL ORDER Judge: Cotterell, Lindsey D |
|
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Compliance Hearing
Judge: Cotterell, Lindsey D |
|
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Protection Order Respondent present at last hearing Judge: Cotterell, Lindsey D |
|
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Copy of Supporting Evidence |
|
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing CT SIGNS REISSUANCE AND SETS MATTER TO 11/28/2022 AT 1:00 PM Judge: Nelson, David A |
|
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Compliance Hearing
Judge: Nelson, David A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.