Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ashley, Brian Reese filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Cowlitz County, WA, . Cowlitz County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2022 |
CategoryHar Unlawful Harassment |
Last RefreshedMarch 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCowlitz County, WA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Compliance Hearing Declaration of Nonsurrender filed Judge: Nelson, David A |
|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order on Review Weapon Surrender Compliance Respondent in Compliance Judge: Nelson, David A |
|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing CT SIGNS ORDER OF COMPLIANCE Judge: Nelson, David A |
|
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Sheriffs Return on Service | |
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing CT SIGNS AMENDED ORDER TO SURRENDER WEAPONS AND SETS COMPLIANCE FOR 03/28/2022 AT 1:00PM Judge: Nelson, David A |
|
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration of NonSurrender | |
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Surrender Weapon CPL Restriction Amended Judge: Nelson, David A |
|
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Compliance Hearing Verification-Respondent not served Judge: Nelson, David A |
|
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Compliance Hearing
Judge: Nelson, David A |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Verification Re Service of Protection Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.