Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Olson, Deborah L, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Cowlitz County, WA, . Cowlitz County, WA Superior Courts with Gary B. Bashor presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGary B. Bashor Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 24, 2021 |
CategoryEst Estate |
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationCowlitz County, WA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Declaration of Completion | |
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Completion of Probate |
|
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice to Creditors | |
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Publication | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters of Administration | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Oath | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution NonIntervention Probate | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Letters of Administration
Judge: Bashor, Gary |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing CT APPROVES PETITION AND SIGNS ORDER Judge: Bashor, Gary |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.