Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Pierce Group Master Endowment Care Fund, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Lee, Wendy, against Kandi, Emiel A, Kastle Enterprises Llc, Kuehner, Michael K, Olympic Trust, represented by Ramsey, G Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Cowlitz County, WA, . Cowlitz County, WA Superior Courts with David A. Nelson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 02, 2021 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCowlitz County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Original order provided to ct admin VH Judge: Karmy, Jill |
|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing CT SETS MATTER TO 08/23/2023 AT 2:00PM Judge: Karmy, Jill |
|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel
Judge: Karmy, Jill |
|
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Limited Admission |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing CT RESERVES ON A RULING; CT SETS MATTER TO 7/26/2023 AT 2:00PM Judge: Nelson, David A |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel
Judge: Nelson, David A |
|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service by Mail | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Findings Order Compeling Compliance With Discovery Request |
|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit in Support of Motion for Order to Compel Production of Documents |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.