Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Hash, Clinton, Jr, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Harlan, Beau D., against American Family Mutual Insurance Company Si, King, Daniel, Trautman, Devon, represented by Bendele, Levi Lewis, Iii, Hall, Ryan J, in the jurisdiction of Cowlitz County, WA, . Cowlitz County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 11, 2021 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCowlitz County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address and Change of Attorney's Firm Name for Defendant's King and Troutman |
|
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Arbitration Award | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Scudder, Thad |
|
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Arbitration Settlement |
|
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Association of Counsel | |
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Arbitration Hearing Date |
|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appointment as Arbitrator
Judge: Bashor, Gary |
|
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Declination to Serve as Arbitrator |
|
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Association of Counsel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.