Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Verde Mountain Fund Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Green, Matthew D., against Apropos Llc, Gl Ventures Llc, Vulcan Mountain Farm Llc, Vulcan Mountain Natural Llc, represented by Jenkins, Nicholas L, in the jurisdiction of Cowlitz County, WA, . Cowlitz County, WA Superior Courts with Gary B. Bashor presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2019 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCowlitz County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment Order Provided to Clerk for Presentation-tw Judge: Bashor, Gary |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Affidavit | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit Thomas Garlock |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Summary Judgment | |
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment | |
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense | |
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit for Garnishment | |
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.