Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Van Den Houten, Stormy, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Nelson, David Allen, against R & S Delivery Service Inc, Stacy, Jane Doe, Stacy, Richard, Fedex, Fedex Ground Package System Inc, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Cowlitz County, WA, . Cowlitz County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 12, 2019 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedMay 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCowlitz County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
December 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Bashor, Gary |
|
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons on First Amended Complaint |
|
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint First Amended |
|
August 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service Sub: Richard Stacy |
|
August 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons | |
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet | |
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Complaint for Damages |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.