Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Highlander Development Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Imboden, Micheal James, Jr, against Sharp, Steven, represented by Couto, Eleanor Marie, in the jurisdiction of Cowlitz County, WA, . Cowlitz County, WA Superior Courts with M. Jamie Imboden presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2014 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCowlitz County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Receipts 19: RECEIPT FROM JAMIE IMBODEN; |
|
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Trust Fund Disbursed -: TRUST FUND DISBURSED; |
|
February 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order to Disburse Funds 18: AGREED ORDER TO DISBURSE FUNDS; JUDGE STEPHEN M. WARNING; |
|
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Stipulation 17: STIPULATED AGREEMENT & ORDER (CR2A); JUDGE STEPHEN M. WARNING; |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Trust Received - Tender -: TRUST RCVD-TENDER; |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Writ 14: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON WRIT; |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order 16: ORDER STAYING WRIT; JUDGE STEPHEN M. WARNING; |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order for Stay of Proceedings 15: ORDER FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS; TO ENFORCE JUDGMENT; JUDGE STEPHEN M. WARNING; |
|
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ of Restitution 13: WRIT OF RESTITUTION; |
|
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Received - Affidavit -: FILING FEE RCVD-AFFIDAVIT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.