Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lamusga, Asa Chodesh filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, WA, . Columbia County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 19, 2019 |
CategoryDic Dissolution Of Marriage With Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationColumbia County, WA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel
Judge: Burns, Brooke J |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Compel
Judge: Burns, Brooke J |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Burns, Brooke J |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel | |
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney & Substitution of Asa LaMusga of Gravis Law, PLLC |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Unclaimed Clerk's Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Report Re Clerk's Dismissal from Adam Sandoval, Aty for Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.