Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Dayton, City Of, filed a(n) Inj Injunction case represented by Plant, Quinn N, against Columbia County, Wa, Culwell, Rea L, represented by Aufderheide, Jacquelyn Moore, Kamerrer, William Dale, in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, WA, . Columbia County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2016 |
CategoryInj Injunction |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationColumbia County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Motion Petition Prosecuting Aty's Motion for Payment of Aty's Fees Judge: Shea-Brown, Jacqueline |
|
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice Stipulated Motion and Judge: Shea-Brown, Jacqueline |
|
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit Of Service |
|
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Shea-Brown, Jacqueline |
|
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Reply Def. Rea Culwell in Suprt of Mot for Ord Directing Co. to Pay for Her Defense of this Action |
|
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit of Rea Culwell in Suprt of Mot for Ord Directing County to Pay for Her Defense of this Action |
|
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit of Merle Jackson in Support of Col.Co. Response |
|
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Response Columbia County's to Pros Mot for Order Directing County to Pay for Defense of Action |
|
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Voluntary Dismissal of Cross-Claim Judge: Shea-Brown, Jacqueline |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.