Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Flem, Robin Allan filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, WA, . Columbia County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 11, 2016 |
CategoryDvp Domestic Violence |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationColumbia County, WA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Modifying Terminating Terms of Protective Order 12: ORD MOD/TRM TERMS OF PROT ORD; |
|
June 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
C Civil Matters PETITION FOR ORDER FOR PROTECTION |
|
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion and Affidavit Declaration 11: MOTION AND AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION; |
|
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Reissuing Temporary Protection Order 9: ORD REISSUING TEMP PROTECTION ORDER; |
|
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 10: MOTION HEARING; 06-01-2016C; PETITION FOR ORDER FOR PROTECTION; |
|
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
C Civil Matters PETITION FOR ORDER FOR PROTECTION |
|
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance 8: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE J. KARL; |
|
May 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance 7: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE C. PEARSON; |
|
May 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Service 5: SHERIFF'S RETURN OF SERVICE 5/13/16; |
|
May 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Service 6: SHERIFF'S RETURN OF SERVICE 5/16/16; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.