Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
La Granja Farms, Llc, filed a(n) Zoning - Property case against Walla Walla, County, in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, WA, . Columbia County, WA Superior Courts with Scott D. Gallina presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 11, 2016 |
CategoryLupa Land Use Petition Act |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationColumbia County, WA |
Matter TypeZoning |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Potential Unavailability of Counsel (AG's) |
|
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Courts Decision on Motion for Relief from Judgment Judge: Gallina, Scott D |
|
April 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Reply Support of Motion for Relief from Order |
|
April 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Gallina, Scott D |
|
April 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Re: Relief From Order Judge: Gallina, Scott D |
|
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Response to Order to Show Cause |
|
April 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Relief from Order and Notice of Hearing Judge: Gallina, Scott D |
|
April 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Receipts Ex Parte Fee for Order to Show Cause Re Relief from Order & Notice of Hearing |
|
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion & Memorandum for Relief from Order Pursuant to CR 60(b)(11) w/Attached Exhibits |
|
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit of Patrick R. Moberg in Support of Motion for Relief from Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.