Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Matkins, Matthew Robert, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Posner, Quinn Harrison, against Johnson, Lucy, represented by Taylor, Matthew Robert, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts with Emily A. Sheldrick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEmily A. Sheldrick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2023 |
CategoryUnd Residential Unlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Stricken In Court Other Reason | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Attorney | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Unlawful Detainer SHOW CAUSE *FR 2/2 TO 2/9* Judge: Sheldrick, Emily |
|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit (P) |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Posting | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit (P) |
|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.