Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bianda, Victoria, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Bianda, Joshua, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Michael S. Williams presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 28, 2010 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions522 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time522 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management 941110-Conference: Case Management; Bianda, V. vs. Bianda, J. ; Judge: J21196 Price Diane Judge: Price, Diane |
|
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment 926110-Judgment Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per JUDGMENT [926110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice 912910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per NOTICE [912910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Nov 1 2011 Type: 944110 - Judgment/Order Manner : 941110 - Before Hearing |
|
October 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Stipulation 913510-Stipulation Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per STIPULATION [913510] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
October 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration 913310-Declaration Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per DECLARATION [913310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
October 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 913610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [913610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
October 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management 941110-Conference: Case Management; Bianda, V. vs. Bianda, J. ; Judge: J21196 Price Diane Judge: Price, Diane |
|
September 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Returned or Undeliverable Mail 914510-Returned/Undeliverable Mail Filed/Issued By: RETURNED/UNDELIVERABLE MAIL [914510] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
September 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 912920-Notice of Hearing Filed/Issued By: 921100 - Court Clerk NOTICE OF HEARING [912920] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By COURT CLERK [921100] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.