Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Piculell, Lee, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Fig, William G, against Towing And Recovery Services, Inc, represented by Schilling, Stephanie Bourgeois, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts with David E. Gregerson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 12, 2022 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference P Judge: Gregerson, David E |
|
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Default Judgment | |
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.