Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Dixon, Benjamin, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Melnick, Benjamin Paul, against Naeem, Ateeqa, represented by Lee, Heather Rachel, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts with John P. Fairgrieve presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 05, 2022 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference P Judge: Fairgrieve, John P |
|
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal Stipulated | |
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.