Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bergstrom, Robert, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kauffman, Katherine Ann, against Progressive Insurance, Smith, Lawrence, represented by Foley, Douglas Fredrick, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts with Emily A. Sheldrick presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2021 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order DISMISSING CASE |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Sheldrick, Emily |
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Acceptance of Service | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Dismissing Litigant | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.