Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hanson, Hillary, Hanson, Michael, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Leatham, Stephen Garrett, against Glavin Development, Llc, represented by Whitlock, Douglas O, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts with Emily A. Sheldrick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEmily A. Sheldrick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12 8 DAYS Judge: Sheldrick, Emily |
|
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing CASE STATUS CONFERENCE Judge: Sheldrick, Emily |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12 8 DAYS Judge: Sheldrick, Emily |
|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing CASE STATUS CONFERENCE Judge: Sheldrick, Emily |
|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Schedule 2ND AMENDED |
|
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Order to Continue Case Schedule | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing #11 3rd Party Defendant/ Motion to Continue Trial Date and Amend Case Schedule Judge: Sheldrick, Emily |
|
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit in Opposition P |
|
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Joinder 3RD PARTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.