Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bear-Kujava, Teddi, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Philbrook, Matthew, against The Travelers Home And Marine Insurance Company, represented by Mclellan, Ryan J., in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts with Derek J. Vanderwood presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDerek J. Vanderwood Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12
Judge: Vanderwood, Derek J |
|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12
Judge: Vanderwood, Derek J |
|
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12
Judge: Vanderwood, Derek J |
|
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Continue Trial Date - Stip - D Judge: Vanderwood, Derek J |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for Continuance of Trial Date | |
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Schedule Amended |
|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Citation Amended |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.