Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Allred, Christopher, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case against State Of Washington, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts with Gregory M. Gonzales presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory M. Gonzales Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 11, 2021 |
CategoryWhc Writ Of Habeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Request | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letter FROM DEPT 7 |
|
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Letter -P |
|
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Letter FROM DEPT 7 |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial 9:00 AM Judge: Gonzales, Gregory M |
|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Cancelled Courts Request | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing MT F/RECONSIDERATION - P Judge: Snider, Jennifer K |
|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Courts Decision | |
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter FROM DPT 7 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.