Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Araujo, Josefina Cordero, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Pak, James Lee, against Sixt Rent A Car, Llc, Zhou, Jane Doe, Zhou, Kevin, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, WA, . Clark County, WA Superior Courts with Suzan L. Clark presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSuzan L. Clark Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 23, 2021 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference P- Judge: Clark, Suzan L |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal With Prejudice | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Findings | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (P) |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.